THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 09:34:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The University of Western Australia Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Darwin Hospital
105 Rocklands Dr
Tiwi NT 0810
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The University of Western Australia Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Darwin Hospital
105 Rocklands Dr
Tiwi NT 0810
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA KIERATH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KIERATH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KIERATH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KIERATH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KIERATH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KIERATH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KIERATH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA KIERATH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KIERATH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KIERATH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KIERATH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KIERATH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KIERATH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KIERATH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The University of Western Australia Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery
06 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 05 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 06 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 05 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023