THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:22:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ludwig-Maximilians-Universität München Medizinische Fakultät, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Spitalstrasse
Luzern 6004
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Rue Willy Donzé 6
Genève Switzerland 1205
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ludwig-Maximilians-Universität München Medizinische Fakultät, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Spitalstrasse
Luzern 6004
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Rue Willy Donzé 6
Genève Switzerland 1205
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA MARIA KOENIG may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KOENIG is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KOENIG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KOENIG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KOENIG shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KOENIG ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KOENIG ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA MARIA KOENIG may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KOENIG is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KOENIG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KOENIG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KOENIG shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KOENIG ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KOENIG ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ludwig-Maximilians-Universität München Medizinische Fakultät, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Surgery
01 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Surgery
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Surgery
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023