Medical School:
Western University, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine |
01 May 2026 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Apr 2026 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine |
14 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Western University |
EL - General Internal Medicine |
21 Oct 2024 to 13 Jan 2025 |
Western University |
EL - General Internal Medicine |
05 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
Western University |
EL - Internal Medicine |
10 Apr 2023 to 07 May 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 May 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Apr 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine
DATE:
14 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
EL - General Internal Medicine
DATE:
21 Oct 2024 to 13 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
EL - General Internal Medicine
DATE:
05 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
EL - Internal Medicine
DATE:
10 Apr 2023 to 07 May 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto