THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:21:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA HANNAH SHERIFF shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHERIFF is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. SHERIFF shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHERIFF is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHERIFF shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHERIFF is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHERIFF no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA HANNAH SHERIFF shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHERIFF is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. SHERIFF shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHERIFF is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHERIFF shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHERIFF is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHERIFF no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
EL - Respirology
03 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
McMaster University
EL - Respirology
10 May 2023 to 06 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Respirology
DATE: 03 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Respirology
DATE: 10 May 2023 to 06 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2023