THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:42:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin St
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin St
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ZAKI I AL ZAHIR may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL ZAHIR is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. AL ZAHIR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL ZAHIR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL ZAHIR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL ZAHIR ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL ZAHIR ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 December, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ZAKI I AL ZAHIR may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL ZAHIR is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. AL ZAHIR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL ZAHIR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL ZAHIR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL ZAHIR ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL ZAHIR ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 December, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Adult Echocardiography
29 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Adult Echocardiography
01 Jan 2024 to 28 Jan 2024
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Echocardiography
DATE: 29 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Adult Echocardiography
DATE: 01 Jan 2024 to 28 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Dec 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Dec 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2024