Medical School:
Grant Government Medical College, Mumbai, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology |
02 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology |
01 Jul 2025 to 01 Jul 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology |
02 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology |
01 Jul 2024 to 01 Jul 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology |
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology |
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE:
02 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 01 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE:
02 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 01 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE:
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto