THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:25:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais (UFMG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 88 Scott Street
Suite 2403
Toronto Ontario M5E 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4364354802
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 170 Elizabeth St
Hospital of Sick Children
Critical Care Department
Toronto ON M5G 1E8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais (UFMG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 88 Scott Street
Suite 2403
Toronto Ontario M5E 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4364354802
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 170 Elizabeth St
Hospital of Sick Children
Critical Care Department
Toronto ON M5G 1E8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIANA DE CAUX BUENO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DE CAUX BUENO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DE CAUX BUENO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DE CAUX BUENO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DE CAUX BUENO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DE CAUX BUENO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DE CAUX BUENO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIANA DE CAUX BUENO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DE CAUX BUENO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DE CAUX BUENO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DE CAUX BUENO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DE CAUX BUENO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DE CAUX BUENO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DE CAUX BUENO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais (UFMG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024