THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:37:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Western University of Health Sciences College of Osteopathic Medicine of the Pacific, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Western University of Health Sciences College of Osteopathic Medicine of the Pacific, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Feb 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 14 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JIAFEI NIU may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JIAFEI NIU may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Western University of Health Sciences College of Osteopathic Medicine of the Pacific, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2024