Medical School:
Edinburgh Medical School, College of Medicine and Veterinary Medicine, University of Edinburgh, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery |
01 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery |
01 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto