THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:14:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Terna Medical College, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sion Koliwada Road
Sion
Mumbai 400022
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Terna Medical College, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sion Koliwada Road
Sion
Mumbai 400022
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIHAR SANDEEP DESAI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DESAI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DESAI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DESAI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DESAI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DESAI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DESAI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIHAR SANDEEP DESAI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DESAI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DESAI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DESAI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DESAI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DESAI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DESAI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Terna Medical College, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
24 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Hematology
01 Aug 2023 to 23 Oct 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 24 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Hematology
DATE: 01 Aug 2023 to 23 Oct 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023