Medical School:
The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
16 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 15 Jul 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE:
16 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 15 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE:
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto