THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine Anguilla, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-272-8210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic and Clinical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic and Clinical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine Anguilla, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-272-8210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic and Clinical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic and Clinical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENIKO HOLLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENIKO HOLLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine Anguilla, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Aug 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2023