THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:05:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sheikh Zayed Medical College and Hospital, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: 519-254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sheikh Zayed Medical College and Hospital, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: 519-254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Apr 2025
05 Nov 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 10 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Nov 05 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SYED HAMMAD ALI BUKHARI may practise psychiatry at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Windsor Regional Hospital in Windsor, Ontario;

(ii) Erie Shores Healthcare in Leamington, Ontario;

(iii) Canadian Mental Health Association in Windsor, Ontario;

(iv) Downtown Mission in Windsor, Ontario;

(v) Salvation Army in Windsor, Ontario; and

(vi) Homeless Hub in Windsor, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on November 5, 2026, or when Dr. BUKHARI’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. BUKHARI’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. BUKHARI’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 06 November, 2023, and will expire on or before 05 November, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SYED HAMMAD ALI BUKHARI may practise psychiatry at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Windsor Regional Hospital in Windsor, Ontario;

(ii) Erie Shores Healthcare in Leamington, Ontario;

(iii) Canadian Mental Health Association in Windsor, Ontario;

(iv) Downtown Mission in Windsor, Ontario;

(v) Salvation Army in Windsor, Ontario; and

(vi) Homeless Hub in Windsor, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on November 5, 2026, or when Dr. BUKHARI’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. BUKHARI’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. BUKHARI’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 06 November, 2023, and will expire on or before 05 November, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sheikh Zayed Medical College and Hospital, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Apr 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 05 Nov 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2023