THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 19:41:48 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Technischen Universität München Fakultät für Medizin, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kölner Platz 1
München Klinik Schwabing
Kinderklinik
Station 13d
München Bayern 80804
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Technischen Universität München Fakultät für Medizin, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kölner Platz 1
München Klinik Schwabing
Kinderklinik
Station 13d
München Bayern 80804
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZHOU LI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. LI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. LI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. LI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. LI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZHOU LI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. LI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. LI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. LI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. LI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Technischen Universität München Fakultät für Medizin, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 23 Sep 2023
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 23 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2023