Medical School:
University College Cork School of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Oct 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
19 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology |
27 Nov 2023 to 18 Feb 2024 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Oct 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
19 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
DATE:
27 Nov 2023 to 18 Feb 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto