THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:19:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Aug 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Aug 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 21 Apr 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2023