THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
University of Ottawa
Department of Radiology, Radiation Oncology and Medical Physics
Box 232
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 06 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
University of Ottawa
Department of Radiology, Radiation Oncology and Medical Physics
Box 232
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 06 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALESSANDER RAMOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALESSANDER RAMOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023