THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:27:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College Dublin School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College Dublin School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL PATRICK CONNON may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CONNON is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CONNON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CONNON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CONNON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. CONNON ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. CONNON ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL PATRICK CONNON may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CONNON is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CONNON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CONNON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CONNON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. CONNON ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. CONNON ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College Dublin School of Medicine, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
02 Aug 2025 to 08 Aug 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2025 to 01 Aug 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
30 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Neurology
07 Aug 2023 to 29 Oct 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 02 Aug 2025 to 08 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 01 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 30 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurology
DATE: 07 Aug 2023 to 29 Oct 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023