THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:27:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Rheumatology
01 Jul 2024 to 28 Feb 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Rheumatology
01 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Rheumatology
20 Apr 2024 to 31 May 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Rheumatology
01 Mar 2024 to 19 Apr 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Rheumatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 28 Feb 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Rheumatology
DATE: 01 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Rheumatology
DATE: 20 Apr 2024 to 31 May 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Rheumatology
DATE: 01 Mar 2024 to 19 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2024