THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:24:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Grant Government Medical College, Mumbai, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KKR IYER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Nov 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Grant Government Medical College, Mumbai, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KKR IYER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Nov 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Grant Government Medical College, Mumbai, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Sep 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Mar 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Feb 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Jan 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Dec 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Nov 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Oct 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2023