Medical School:
Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto