THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
Hospital for Sick Children
Pediatric Endocrinology
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168135991
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
Hospital for Sick Children
Pediatric Endocrinology
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168135991
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIYA ALLAHWALA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALLAHWALA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALLAHWALA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALLAHWALA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALLAHWALA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALLAHWALA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALLAHWALA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIYA ALLAHWALA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALLAHWALA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALLAHWALA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALLAHWALA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALLAHWALA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALLAHWALA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALLAHWALA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023