THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 02:59:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond St
Western University
London ON N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond St
Western University
London ON N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAYEF MOHAMMAD I ALAWADH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALAWADH is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. ALAWADH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALAWADH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALAWADH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALAWADH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALAWADH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAYEF MOHAMMAD I ALAWADH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALAWADH is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. ALAWADH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALAWADH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALAWADH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALAWADH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALAWADH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
01 Jul 2023 to 23 Sep 2023
Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 23 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023