THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:38:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Taibah University College of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
London Health Sciences Centre
London Ontario N6G 2M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1151 Richmond Street
Western University & Affiliated Clinical Teaching Units
Postgraduate Medical Education
Health Sciences Addition – Room H124
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Taibah University College of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
London Health Sciences Centre
London Ontario N6G 2M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1151 Richmond Street
Western University & Affiliated Clinical Teaching Units
Postgraduate Medical Education
Health Sciences Addition – Room H124
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBARAA MOHAMMED S MOHAMMED may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MOHAMMED is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. MOHAMMED shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MOHAMMED is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MOHAMMED shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MOHAMMED ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MOHAMMED ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBARAA MOHAMMED S MOHAMMED may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MOHAMMED is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. MOHAMMED shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MOHAMMED is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MOHAMMED shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MOHAMMED ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MOHAMMED ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Taibah University College of Medicine, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023