Medical School:
King Saud bin Abdulaziz University for Health Sciences College of Medicine, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology |
18 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology |
05 Oct 2024 to 17 Oct 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology |
01 Jul 2024 to 04 Oct 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology |
10 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Nephrology |
18 Oct 2023 to 09 Jan 2024 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE:
18 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE:
05 Oct 2024 to 17 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 04 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE:
10 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
DATE:
18 Oct 2023 to 09 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto