THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:20:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: WENDER, ORNIT (Used Until: 28 Mar 2023)
Medical School: Bar-Ilan University Faculty of Medicine in the Galilee, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A-2 Brahms Ave
North York ON M2H 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6479206071
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: WENDER, ORNIT (Used Until: 28 Mar 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Bar-Ilan University Faculty of Medicine in the Galilee, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A-2 Brahms Ave
North York ON M2H 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6479206071
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ORNIT NACHMANI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. NACHMANI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. NACHMANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NACHMANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. NACHMANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. NACHMANI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. NACHMANI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 28 February, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ORNIT NACHMANI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. NACHMANI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. NACHMANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NACHMANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. NACHMANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. NACHMANI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. NACHMANI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 28 February, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bar-Ilan University Faculty of Medicine in the Galilee, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Feb 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
26 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2024 to 25 Mar 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 28 Feb 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 26 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2024 to 25 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 28 Feb 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 28 Feb 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2024