THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:31:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 425-5025 Rue Sherbrooke O
Montréal QC H4A 1S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jan 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 425-5025 Rue Sherbrooke O
Montréal QC H4A 1S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jan 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
03 Apr 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 03 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from April 3, 2025, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Eva Chadnova in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chadnova to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. EVA CHADNOVA
(“Dr. Chadnova”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE
(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“CPD” means continuing professional development;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
(2) I, Dr. Chadnova, certificate of registration number 148083, am a member of the College. I acknowledge that the College has inquired into my compliance with the requirement to participate in a program of CPD.
(3) I, Dr. Chadnova, am currently not practising medicine in Ontario and I am entering into this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with the CPD requirement under section 29 of Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under the Medicine Act, 1991).

B. UNDERTAKING
(4) I, Dr. Chadnova, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(5) I, Dr. Chadnova, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not practise medicine in Ontario until each and every one of the following conditions have been met:
(a) I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days’ notice to the College of my intent to return to the practice of medicine in Ontario;
(b) I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a program of CPD that meets the requirements for CPD of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for CPD set by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada; and
(c) The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
(6) I, Dr. Chadnova, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise and before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(7) I, Dr. Chadnova, undertake to abide by the College’s Policy on Closing a Medical Practice.
C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS
(8) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(9) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to practice, the College may, among other things:
(a) request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
(b) request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or monitoring agreement with the College.
(10) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(11) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.
(12) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(13) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
(14) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Rather than completing the continuing professional development required of all members, Dr. Chadnova has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

D. CONSENT
(15) I, Dr. Chadnova, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(16) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A” and that the consent forms part of this Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from April 3, 2025, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Eva Chadnova in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chadnova to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. EVA CHADNOVA
(“Dr. Chadnova”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE
(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“CPD” means continuing professional development;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
(2) I, Dr. Chadnova, certificate of registration number 148083, am a member of the College. I acknowledge that the College has inquired into my compliance with the requirement to participate in a program of CPD.
(3) I, Dr. Chadnova, am currently not practising medicine in Ontario and I am entering into this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with the CPD requirement under section 29 of Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under the Medicine Act, 1991).

B. UNDERTAKING
(4) I, Dr. Chadnova, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(5) I, Dr. Chadnova, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not practise medicine in Ontario until each and every one of the following conditions have been met:
(a) I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days’ notice to the College of my intent to return to the practice of medicine in Ontario;
(b) I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a program of CPD that meets the requirements for CPD of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for CPD set by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada; and
(c) The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
(6) I, Dr. Chadnova, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise and before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(7) I, Dr. Chadnova, undertake to abide by the College’s Policy on Closing a Medical Practice.
C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS
(8) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(9) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to practice, the College may, among other things:
(a) request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
(b) request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or monitoring agreement with the College.
(10) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(11) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.
(12) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(13) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
(14) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Rather than completing the continuing professional development required of all members, Dr. Chadnova has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

D. CONSENT
(15) I, Dr. Chadnova, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(16) I, Dr. Chadnova, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A” and that the consent forms part of this Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 03 Apr 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eva Chadnova to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 3, 2025:
 
Rather than completing the continuing professional development required of all members, Dr. Chadnova has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 03 Apr 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eva Chadnova to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 3, 2025:
 
Rather than completing the continuing professional development required of all members, Dr. Chadnova has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2023
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2023