THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:21:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 88 Maplewood Ave
Hamilton ON L8M 1W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 88 Maplewood Ave
Hamilton ON L8M 1W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLIVER ALBERT AQUINO KARADJIAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KARADJIAN is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. KARADJIAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KARADJIAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KARADJIAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KARADJIAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KARADJIAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLIVER ALBERT AQUINO KARADJIAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KARADJIAN is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. KARADJIAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KARADJIAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KARADJIAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KARADJIAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KARADJIAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Medicine
01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Palliative Medicine
DATE: 01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023