THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2023
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Victory 3
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2023

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Victory 3
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISON NATALIE ROSS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ROSS is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. ROSS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ROSS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ROSS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ROSS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ROSS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISON NATALIE ROSS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ROSS is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. ROSS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ROSS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ROSS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ROSS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ROSS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2023
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023