THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:40:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2023
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: McMaster University, 2023

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANRAJ SINGH NIJJAR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. NIJJAR is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. NIJJAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NIJJAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. NIJJAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. NIJJAR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. NIJJAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANRAJ SINGH NIJJAR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. NIJJAR is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. NIJJAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NIJJAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. NIJJAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. NIJJAR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. NIJJAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2023
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023