THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 07:05:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: Beydoun, Mahdi Hassan (Used Until: 09 Jun 2024) Beydoun, Mahdi Hassan (Used Until: 09 Jun 2024)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Beydoun, Mahdi Hassan (Used Until: 09 Jun 2024) Beydoun, Mahdi Hassan (Used Until: 09 Jun 2024)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - General Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 28 Jul 2024
McMaster University
EL - General Internal Medicine
12 Feb 2024 to 08 Mar 2024
University of Ottawa
EL - General Internal Medicine
23 Oct 2023 to 17 Nov 2023
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: EL - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 28 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 12 Feb 2024 to 08 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 23 Oct 2023 to 17 Nov 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Mar 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Nov 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2023