Medical School:
Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2023
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
McMaster University |
AVP - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023 |
McMaster University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University