Medical School:
Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology |
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
AVP - Urology |
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023 |
University of Ottawa |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
DATE:
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Urology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa