THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:54:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shiraz University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 451 Smyth Rd
University of Ottawa
Ottawa ON K1H 8M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Shiraz University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 451 Smyth Rd
University of Ottawa
Ottawa ON K1H 8M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKTA RABIEI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RABIEI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. RABIEI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RABIEI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. RABIEI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RABIEI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RABIEI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKTA RABIEI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RABIEI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. RABIEI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RABIEI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. RABIEI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RABIEI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RABIEI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shiraz University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
AVP - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: AVP - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023