Medical School:
University of Ottawa, 2023
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
06 May 2026 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 05 May 2026 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Queen's University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
06 May 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 05 May 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University