THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:49:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2023
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-853-3103
Fax: 905-853-2533

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2023

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-853-3103
Fax: 905-853-2533

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EHSAN YAVARI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. YAVARI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. YAVARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YAVARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. YAVARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. YAVARI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. YAVARI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EHSAN YAVARI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. YAVARI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. YAVARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YAVARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. YAVARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. YAVARI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. YAVARI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2023
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023