THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:42:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2023
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 Pinnacle Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 968-9840
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2023

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 Pinnacle Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 968-9840
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADELEINE ROSE SMITH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SMITH is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. SMITH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SMITH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SMITH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SMITH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SMITH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 20 October, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADELEINE ROSE SMITH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SMITH is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. SMITH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SMITH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SMITH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SMITH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SMITH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 20 October, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2023
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
01 Jul 2025 to 20 Oct 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 20 Oct 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 20 Oct 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 20 Oct 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023