THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:17:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade de Coimbra Faculdade de Medicina, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Clarence St
Kingston ON K7L 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade de Coimbra Faculdade de Medicina, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Clarence St
Kingston ON K7L 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATARINA PEREIRA DA SILVA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PEREIRA DA SILVA is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. PEREIRA DA SILVA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PEREIRA DA SILVA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PEREIRA DA SILVA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PEREIRA DA SILVA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PEREIRA DA SILVA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATARINA PEREIRA DA SILVA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PEREIRA DA SILVA is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. PEREIRA DA SILVA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PEREIRA DA SILVA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PEREIRA DA SILVA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PEREIRA DA SILVA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PEREIRA DA SILVA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade de Coimbra Faculdade de Medicina, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Palliative Care)
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
AVP - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 23 Sep 2023
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Palliative Care)
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 23 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023