THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:16:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2023
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Health Network
Dept of Family & Community Medicine
Suite 410
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-431-8200
Extension: 6591
Fax: 416-439-8052

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2023

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Health Network
Dept of Family & Community Medicine
Suite 410
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-431-8200
Extension: 6591
Fax: 416-439-8052

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIA IBRAHIM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. IBRAHIM is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. IBRAHIM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. IBRAHIM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. IBRAHIM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. IBRAHIM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. IBRAHIM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 11 January, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIA IBRAHIM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. IBRAHIM is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. IBRAHIM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. IBRAHIM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. IBRAHIM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. IBRAHIM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. IBRAHIM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 11 January, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2023
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 11 Jan 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
13 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 12 Jan 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 11 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 13 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 12 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 11 Jan 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 11 Jan 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023