THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:01:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital - London Health Sciences Center
Orthopaedic Surgery
London ON N6G 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital London Health Sciences Center
Orthopedic surgery
London ON N6G 2J9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital - London Health Sciences Center
Orthopaedic Surgery
London ON N6G 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital London Health Sciences Center
Orthopedic surgery
London ON N6G 2J9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINCENT ROY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ROY is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. ROY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ROY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ROY shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ROY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ROY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINCENT ROY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ROY is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. ROY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ROY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ROY shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ROY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ROY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023