Medical School:
Medical University of Lodz Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine |
24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Western University |
AVP - Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 23 Sep 2023 |
Western University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 23 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY:
Western University