Medical School:
V.N. Karazin Kharkiv National University School of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics |
01 Jun 2026 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics |
01 Jul 2025 to 31 May 2026 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics |
01 Jun 2025 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics |
21 Oct 2024 to 31 May 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics |
01 Jul 2024 to 20 Oct 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics |
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
AVP - Pediatrics |
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jun 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 31 May 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jun 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE:
21 Oct 2024 to 31 May 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 20 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE:
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto