THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:14:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-222 Dixon Rd
Clinic
Pediatric urgent care clinic
106-222
Etobicoke ON M9P 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168508947
Fax: No Information Available
Address: C107-3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga ON L5B 0E4
Phone: 905-366-4441
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2540 Postmaster Dr
Oakville ON L6M 0N2
Phone: (905) 847-5437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-478 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6H 6Y3
Phone: 905-257-5050
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 26 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 26 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nesrin Abousetta Professional Medical Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abousetta (CPSO#: 149562 )
Business Address: 106-222 Dixon Road
Toronto Ontario M9P3S5
416-850-8947

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-222 Dixon Rd
Clinic
Pediatric urgent care clinic
106-222
Etobicoke ON M9P 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168508947
Fax: No Information Available
Address: C107-3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga ON L5B 0E4
Phone: 905-366-4441
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2540 Postmaster Dr
Oakville ON L6M 0N2
Phone: (905) 847-5437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-478 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6H 6Y3
Phone: 905-257-5050
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 26 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 26 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nesrin Abousetta Professional Medical Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abousetta (CPSO#: 149562 )
Business Address: 106-222 Dixon Road
Toronto Ontario M9P3S5
416-850-8947

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Feb 2024
25 Feb 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 26 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Feb 25 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. NESRIN MOHAMED SALEM ABOUSETTA may practise pediatrics at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) 3885 Duke of York Boulevard in Mississauga, Ontario;

(ii) 222 Dixon Road in Toronto, Ontario;

(iii) 2540 Postmaster Drive in Oakville, Ontario; and

(iv) 478 Dundas Street West in Oakville, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ABOUSETTA’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. ABOUSETTA’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. ABOUSETTA’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 26 February, 2024, and will expire on or before 25 February, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. NESRIN MOHAMED SALEM ABOUSETTA may practise pediatrics at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) 3885 Duke of York Boulevard in Mississauga, Ontario;

(ii) 222 Dixon Road in Toronto, Ontario;

(iii) 2540 Postmaster Drive in Oakville, Ontario; and

(iv) 478 Dundas Street West in Oakville, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ABOUSETTA’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. ABOUSETTA’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. ABOUSETTA’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 26 February, 2024, and will expire on or before 25 February, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 25 Feb 2027