THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:32:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
31 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 31 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2023