THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:14:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7K 7G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 507-7246
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 284 Earl Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7K 7G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 507-7246
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 284 Earl Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLM FRASER QUIRKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUIRKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLM FRASER QUIRKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUIRKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Oct 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jul 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2023