THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:24:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rawalpindi Medical University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
Children Hospital of Eastern Ontario (CHEO)
Neonatology/Pediatrics,NICU
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-7600
Extension: 2415
Fax: 613-738-4847

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rawalpindi Medical University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
Children Hospital of Eastern Ontario (CHEO)
Neonatology/Pediatrics,NICU
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-7600
Extension: 2415
Fax: 613-738-4847

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Oct 2023
30 Sep 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MUHAMMAD BILAL MAQSOOD may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, at the University of Ottawa, in which Dr. MAQSOOD holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MAQSOOD no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MAQSOOD’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MAQSOOD’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 October, 2023, and expires on 30 September, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. MAQSOOD's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MUHAMMAD BILAL MAQSOOD may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, at the University of Ottawa, in which Dr. MAQSOOD holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MAQSOOD no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MAQSOOD’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MAQSOOD’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 October, 2023, and expires on 30 September, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. MAQSOOD's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rawalpindi Medical University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Sep 2026