Medical School:
Bond University Faculty of Health Sciences & Medicine, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Dec 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery |
14 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - General Surgery |
22 Jan 2024 to 13 Apr 2024 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE:
14 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
DATE:
22 Jan 2024 to 13 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto