THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:03:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
26 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
01 Feb 2024 to 25 Apr 2024
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 26 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Feb 2024 to 25 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2023