THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:15:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
McMaster University
Hamilton ON L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
McMaster University
Hamilton ON L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMBREEN ZAHOOR may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ZAHOOR is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ZAHOOR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZAHOOR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ZAHOOR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ZAHOOR ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ZAHOOR ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 July, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMBREEN ZAHOOR may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ZAHOOR is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ZAHOOR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZAHOOR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ZAHOOR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ZAHOOR ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ZAHOOR ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 July, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
12 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Aug 2023 to 11 Sep 2023
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 12 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Aug 2023 to 11 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Jul 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jul 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023