THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:28:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Grand River Hospital
Emergency Department
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197423611
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
St Mary's Hospital
Emergency Department
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 5197443311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Feb 2025
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Grand River Hospital
Emergency Department
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197423611
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
St Mary's Hospital
Emergency Department
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 5197443311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Feb 2025
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HETSHREE JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HETSHREE JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Feb 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2023